Accounts and annual returns GULSHAN-E-WYCOMBE

Charity number: 1144546
Charity reporting is overdue by 1694 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 598 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1694 days