THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

59 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Joy Richards Trustee 01 September 2018
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
Margaret Anne CHUTER Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
Elizabeth Alison Jones Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
Rev NEIL LAMBERT Trustee 10 January 2014 None on record
David William Moll Trustee 12 March 2019 None on record
REV Gisela Anna Lawson BA Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
Ian Charles Moore Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Judith Nicholls M.A. Trustee 05 March 2021
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Stephen John Frederick CURTIS Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
RITA GREIG Trustee None on record
MELVYN BUCKETT Trustee 06 November 2013
1ST ALDERSHOT BOY SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Carol Ann Lander Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
ALEXANDRA MARY SANDERSON Trustee 08 December 2016
AMAHA WE UGANDA (UK) Received: On time
Michael John Morrice Trustee 05 March 2021 None on record
SYLVIA MURIEL SIMPSON Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Stephen John DEWEY Trustee 02 September 2014 None on record
Paul Kingston Trustee 08 December 2016
CAMBERLEY YOUTH FOR CHRIST Received: On time
COLIN GAWTHROP Trustee 13 March 2014 None on record
Julie CLARK Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Rev PATRICK BUTLER Trustee 10 March 2014
ELVETHAM HEATH LEP Recently registered
CHRISTIANS TOGETHER IN FLEET & CHURCH CROOKHAM Recently registered
Robert Jiagge Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
MARGARET ANN JANES Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
SALLY JEANETTE PRESS Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
REV Beale GRIFFIN BSc MA MBA Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
Dr Christopher James Hunter Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
REV Richard M Smith CF Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
Jayne Beverley MOORE Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
Graham Charles Titterington BSc MSc Trustee 05 November 2013
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Aileen Mary Ashby BTh Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Nina Janet Curley OBE Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
Rev Michael Hopkins Trustee 01 September 2018
ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM WEYSIDE TRUST FUND Received: On time
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST) Received: On time
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH TRUST Received: 18 days late
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SURREY Received: On time
Gillian ter Kuile GRSC PGCE Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
Rev Christopher Blake MA Cantab Chair 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH: SOUTH-EAST DISTRICT Received: On time
Carole GAINES Trustee 10 January 2014 None on record
REV Gina HOFF Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
Denis John Compton Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
Ian Charles Sargeant FCA Trustee
FARNHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
THE MYLNE TRUST Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
ANN POOK Trustee
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
Elizabeth Anne Cooper Trustee 05 December 2019
ELVETHAM HEATH LEP Recently registered
Rev ALAN COSTELLO Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
Thomas Philip Oborski Trustee 05 March 2021
FLEET METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Rev Nicholas Andrew Oborski Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record
Rev PHILIP SIMPKINS Trustee 19 September 2017
KEYNSHAM METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
HUGH ROLFE BRIDSON Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
KYM SUSAN BURGESS Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
SUSAN MARY SMITH Trustee 05 November 2013
FARNBOROUGH CHRISTIAN OUTREACH Received: 8 days late
DAVID KEMBER Trustee None on record
Alison Loveday Noakes Trustee 10 September 2017
FARNHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
Kathryne O'Sullivan Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
JOHN WILLIAM WHEELER Trustee 02 September 2014
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
LINDSEY BREWERTON Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Gillian Anne Bunch Trustee 05 March 2021 None on record
ELIZABETH ANNE GEORGE Trustee 08 December 2016
THE BUSHY LEAZE COMMUNITY SUPPORT FUND Received: On time
ALTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
NEIL GRAY Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
PETER WISBEY Trustee None on record
Colin Ivan Johnston Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Dr FRANCES MARY GAWTHROP Trustee 05 November 2013
EHLERS-DANLOS SUPPORT UK Received: On time
THE EHLERS-DANLOS SUPPORT UK Received: On time
Rev ANDREW MARK MICKLEFIELD Trustee 19 September 2017
WINCHESTER SOCIAL ENTERPRISE Received: On time
THE KINGS ARMS (PETERSFIELD) Received: 2 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON Received: On time
BRIAN SEXTON Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record