Accounts and annual returns SAMUEL WARNEFORD NEEDY PATIENTS FUND

Charity number: 501149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required