Financial history SAMUEL WARNEFORD NEEDY PATIENTS FUND

Charity number: 501149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.21k £5.32k £6.42k £5.50k £5.66k
Total expenditure £6.52k £5.72k £5.90k £4.86k £7.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A