DONCASTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LTD

Charity number: 1138554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 August 2016 On time Download