DONCASTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LTD

Charity number: 1138554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £241.66k £238.99k £246.38k £245.56k £267.78k
Total expenditure £233.93k £229.12k £237.21k £232.11k £261.71k
Income from government contracts £161.90k £175.05k £170.76k £160.92k £158.01k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A