DONCASTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LTD

Charity number: 1138554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN JACKSON Trustee 28 October 2021 None on record
LESLEY JACKSON Trustee 20 August 2018 None on record
Yvonne Lynne Thiede Trustee 17 November 2018 None on record
AMANDA POXTON Trustee 21 February 2012 None on record
JACQUELINE GLADDEN Chair 13 March 2013
THE FRIENDS OF THE DONCASTER MUSEUMS Recently registered
RACHAEL MORRISS Trustee 11 June 2020 None on record