DEDZA WELFARE TRUST (DWT)

Charity number: 1139363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £201.73k £231.19k £287.64k £358.05k £421.38k
Total expenditure £265.87k £206.82k £340.74k £334.39k £403.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A