INNOVATIVE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public by; (a) The relief of sickness and preservation of good mental health by providing support services. (b) The promotion of social inclusion among people suffering from mental illness or diagnosed with learning difficulties and who are socially excluded from society. (c) The Provision, maintenance or improvement of a public park or other public amenity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 December 2010: Standard registration
- 07 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- INGLEBY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.99k | £145.52k | £90.65k | £105.21k | £73.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £286.88k | £150.01k | £90.39k | £64.52k | £58.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 19 September 2017 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 19 September 2017 | 81 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 21 October 2016 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 21 October 2016 | 143 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 30 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 30 April 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/08/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WARWICKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY; (A)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM OR RECOVERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND BY INCREASING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND REHABILITATION AMONGST HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, SERVICE PROVIDERS AND THE PUBLIC. (B) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR DIAGNOSED WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THOSE FACTORS BY PROVIDING SKILLS TRAINING AND REHABILITATION FACILITIES. (C) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK OR OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window