UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1137811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £5.07m £4.98m £2.08m £2.67m £2.45m
Total expenditure £4.82m £5.26m £1.64m £2.49m £2.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £42.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.62m £1.81m £1.73m £1.78m £1.81m
Income - Other trading activities £2.77m £2.50m £201.64k £266.97k £175.29k
Income - Charitable activities £578.25k £599.57k £58.85k £505.19k £368.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £60.68k £73.05k £114.11k £96.10k
Income - Other £109.51k £18.04k £16.25k £3.87k £1.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.96m £1.51m £2.33m £2.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.71m £2.30m £128.62k £159.76k £146.21k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0