UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1137811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Bacon Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
David Moore Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Safa Noor Murad Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Dr Stephanie Jane Harris Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Nicole Ewurabena Akroma Farmer Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Manoj Chowdary Kanikanti Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Jin Lin Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Rhiannon Jenkins Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Karla Wagener Trustee 01 July 2020
STUDENT UNION LETTINGS LIMITED Received: On time
Stuart Anthony Knowles Trustee 01 August 2015 None on record
Ann Marie Deeb Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Georgia Henton Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record