DINGLEY FAMILY AND SPECIALIST EARLY YEARS CENTRES

Charity number: 1137609
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £228.58k £245.68k £110.75k £125.98k £133.24k
Other income £202.07k £288.15k £470.56k £515.27k £514.28k
Total expenditure £496.73k £567.99k £583.64k £672.30k £645.20k