DINGLEY FAMILY AND SPECIALIST EARLY YEARS CENTRES

Charity number: 1137609
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Russell Ashley Fowler Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
Helen Georgina Amner Munslow Trustee 14 June 2018 None on record
Michael Frans Scheepers Trustee 03 September 2020 None on record
GILES AQUILA BEATTIE Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Peter Ian Brogden Trustee 28 May 2020 None on record
Lorna Lesley Fairbairn Trustee 26 October 2017 None on record
DAVID IAN ORMROD Chair None on record
Pritpal Virk Trustee 03 September 2020 None on record
Joy Essien Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
Lucy Alice Rebbeck Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record