PEAK CYCLE LINKS

Charity number: 1139065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.95k £1.61k £2.06k £794 £796
Total expenditure £723 £960 £841 £969 £880
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A