THE BARRINGTON FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1140356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required