BRISTOL HOSPITALITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1138498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £74.66k £142.51k £143.23k £151.76k £290.54k
Total expenditure £66.83k £99.27k £145.15k £171.73k £186.37k
Income from government contracts £7.10k N/A £7.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k N/A N/A £44.90k