CP CUMBRIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1139702
Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 139 days
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 139 days
Annual return 22 February 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 October 2016 On time Download