CP CUMBRIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1139702
Charity reporting is overdue by 137 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 22/02/2019
Total gross income £245.03k £243.69k £218.27k £229.75k £183.87k
Total expenditure £278.18k £258.79k £235.74k £230.07k £199.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A