ROLLADOME ALL SKATE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Using roller sports to engage children and young people into sport, 4 - 18 year olds ,and families as throughout the UK. Addressing physical and mental health, wellbeing, education, employability, crime and community building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £39,641 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Cantwell | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jackson | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Williams | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE JAYNE NESTOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.54k | £62.86k | £100.20k | £52.84k | £158.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.19k | £48.95k | £51.91k | £117.06k | £162.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | £39.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 13 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY 3) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMS AND SESSIONS ON HEALTHY EATING AND NUTRITION.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 NEWARK CRESCENT
LONDON
NW10 7BD
- Phone:
- 02088381171
- Email:
- admin@rolladome.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window