KHARIS MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1139291
Charity reporting is overdue by 175 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £512.40k £845.24k £829.00k £817.02k £975.30k
Total expenditure £335.76k £529.39k £767.96k £681.89k £774.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £512.40k £0 £829.00k £817.02k £969.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.04k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £845.24k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £346
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £333.76k £529.39k £767.96k £681.89k £774.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £2.35k £2.35k £2.75k £325.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0