Financial history ARCANGELO

Charity number: 1139783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £128.88k £268.55k £278.32k £200.17k £321.59k
Total expenditure £110.42k £253.64k £281.31k £223.85k £308.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A