Trustees ARCANGELO
Charity number: 1139783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALYN MARGARET SUSAN WILKINSON | Chair | 17 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Lucy Maddox | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Melissa de-Fry | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clive Anthony Potter | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Giles Mayhew | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Bryan Rockwell | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA JUNE BUCK | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN COHEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.