JALALABAD WELFARE AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1139642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 February 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required