JALALABAD WELFARE AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1139642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £575 £610 £5.90k £938 £1.17k
Total expenditure £946 £570 £5.78k £560 £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A