RED SUN ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Red Sun Provides Information Advice and Guidance (IAG) on Employment and Training to Asylum Seekers, Refugees and their families in Birmingham. The service is provided on a voluntary basis through our Volunteers who are specialists in the above fields both over the phone and face-to-face through appointments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 November 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARIAN TAUGOZI DPSI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KARZAN KAWANI | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARYAM FARAJ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED 23 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF KURDISH AND MIDDLE EASTERN ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN BIRMINGHAM BY A) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING ADVICE ON HOUSING, EMPLOYMENT AND BENEFITS RELATING TO WELFARE
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Connection Service, Red Sun
Lonsdale House
52 Blucher Street
BIRMINGHAM
B1 1QU
- Phone:
- 07939377176
- Email:
- redsunorg@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window