Accounts and annual returns FULLNESS OF CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1137933
Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 159 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 159 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 April 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 February 2021 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required