Financial history FULLNESS OF CHRIST MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1137933
Charity reporting is overdue by 165 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £3.92k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A