NATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR GIVING VOICE

Charity number: 1140266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 09 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required