Accounts and annual returns GHANA NATIONAL COLLEGE PAST STUDENTS ASSOCIATION-UK CHARITY

Charity number: 1139985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 05 March 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 02 August 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 10 March 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 06 March 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required