BIBLE PATTERN CHURCH BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 1138218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £40.99k £38.13k £36.65k £38.07k £36.64k
Total expenditure £42.53k £35.33k £33.80k £33.07k £36.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A