Financial history THE CHRISTIAN BLANDFORD FUND

Charity number: 1139614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £36.87k £101.59k £47.02k £3.19k £19.88k
Total expenditure £19.34k £27.88k £17.58k £17.47k £59.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A