Financial history REDEEMING OUR COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 1139817
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £518.44k £539.51k £531.31k £671.37k £787.01k
Total expenditure £576.24k £591.09k £532.49k £592.90k £651.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £81.36k £38.74k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £408.86k £447.26k £447.22k £434.75k £494.18k
Income - Other trading activities £20.42k £13.50k £3.49k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £86.38k £78.44k £78.31k £235.94k £111.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80 £27 £335 £683 £382
Income - Other £2.70k £274 £1.96k £0 £180.60k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.75k £590.72k £532.48k £592.90k £651.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.49k £369 £11 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.46k £4.20k £3.63k £1.50k £8.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0