STEVENAGE FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1140006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £334.71k £293.51k £385.25k £472.30k £412.80k
Total expenditure £367.61k £288.16k £381.95k £468.04k £393.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £11.16k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £10.57k £10.00k £146.30k