THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN CORRINGHAM

Charity number: 1138056
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 November 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 November 2019 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time Download