Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY OF CARDIOVASCULAR IMAGING / BRITISH SOCIETY OF CARDIOVASCULAR COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY ( BSCI / BSCCT)
Charity number: 1145324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Shambrook BMMRCPFRCR | Chair | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jamie Kitt | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Schofield | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Richard Weir-McCall | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ausami Abbas | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aparna Deshpande | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deepa Gopalan | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jim Stirrup | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUSSELL BULL | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr GARETH MORGAN-HUGHES | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabel Castellano | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.