Financial history PASTON HERITAGE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1140292
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.33k £12.75k £16.27k £51.09k £4.72k
Total expenditure £2.78k £10.48k £17.29k £30.36k £30.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A