Accounts and annual returns IMRAN KHAN RELIEF FUND
Charity number: 1137997

Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 154 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 154 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 274 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2022 | 639 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 31 March 2022 | 639 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 31 March 2022 | 1005 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window