Trustees SUSSEX FESTIVAL OF DANCE AND SONG
Charity number: 1138597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Belinda Arnett-Morrice | Chair | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clark | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Vine | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Smyth | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Allison Highsted | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Vince | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA ANN KIRKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.