YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LONDON

Charity number: 1139725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2019 31 May 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2018 15 August 2019 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2017 15 August 2019 491 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2016 15 August 2019 856 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2016 Not Required