Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE ASCENSION, HANGER HILL WITH WEST TWYFORD, ST MARY

Charity number: 1138274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 February 2019 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 February 2019 119 days late Download Open in new window