Accounts and annual returns ALFAJR TRUST

Charity number: 1139375
Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 233 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2022 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 March 2020 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required