NEWQUAY PERRANPORTH & ST AGNES METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1139481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £145.59k £443.45k £236.00k £251.55k £133.10k
Total expenditure £695.05k £154.42k £148.00k £183.71k £151.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.44k