Trustees HACKNEY DOORWAYS
Charity number: 1139183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Daniels | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Hugh Ford | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brigid Hayden | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lotinga | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Hosgood | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Sheeran | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Stubbings | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Carmody | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Meade | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.