ADVENTIST COMMUNITY MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1138717
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1559 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1559 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1925 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1925 days
Annual return 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2290 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2290 days
Annual return 31 March 2013 05 August 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 05 August 2013 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required