BREAST CANCER UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1138866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nichole Taske Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
B Olufemi Otukoya Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Sharon Nash Trustee 07 April 2020 None on record
Margot Black Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
Jamie Tolentino-Deludet Trustee 13 July 2017
BREAST CANCER UK Received: On time
Mark Jarvis Trustee 07 April 2020 None on record
Wendy Clark Chair 14 June 2018 None on record
Emma Kendall Trustee 13 July 2017
BREAST CANCER UK Received: On time
Dr Alison Giles Trustee 23 May 2016
BREAST CANCER UK Received: On time
Dr Britta Stordal Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Ruth Freeborough Trustee 13 July 2017
BREAST CANCER UK Received: On time