Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET ROTTINGDEAN

Charity number: 1138715
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window