Financial history FERAL CAT WELFARE

Charity number: 1138335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £16.77k £3.65k £2.30k £22.63k £1.67k
Total expenditure £9.91k £8.03k £7.75k £7.87k £5.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A