COMMUNITY RESOURCES FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1140209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £275.41k £275.41k £212.26k £353.85k £393.07k
Total expenditure £265.99k £265.90k £180.40k £300.05k £310.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £22.66k £45.32k £36.45k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £22.66k N/A £17.38k