YOUTH FOR TOMORROW

Charity number: 1139415
Charity reporting is overdue by 886 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 155 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 520 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 886 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 886 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 July 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required