YOUTH FOR TOMORROW

Charity number: 1139415
Charity reporting is overdue by 881 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £34.72k £32.71k £24.24k £24.83k £24.14k
Total expenditure £30.65k £30.29k £24.24k £24.63k £23.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0